California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 31, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 16, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 10, 2016