Assembly | 08/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | In Senate. Held at Desk. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4792.) | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5703.) | ||
Assembly | 08/03/2016 | Measure version as amended on August 1 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 2). | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2016 | Introduced. To print. |