Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5343.) | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5743.) | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | Introduced. To print. |