Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5139.) | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5641.) | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2016 | Introduced. To print. |