California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 21, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 10, 2016