Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 1009.). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 635.) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 570.) | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. To print. |