Assembly | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 5561.) | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6480.) | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | Introduced. To print. |