Assembly | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5568.) | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6330.) Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 6373.) | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |