Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2751.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2231.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|