LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR23
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR23
Compare Versions
ACR23 Chaptered July 21, 2015
ACR23 Enrolled July 9, 2015
ACR23 Amended June 2, 2015
ACR23 Amended May 28, 2015
ACR23 Amended February 19, 2015
ACR23 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR23 Chaptered July 21, 2015
ACR23 Enrolled July 9, 2015
ACR23 Amended June 2, 2015
ACR23 Amended May 28, 2015
ACR23 Amended February 19, 2015
ACR23 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare