LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR25
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR25
Compare Versions
ACR25 Chaptered April 23, 2015
ACR25 Enrolled April 20, 2015
ACR25 Amended March 12, 2015
ACR25 Amended March 4, 2015
ACR25 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR25 Chaptered April 23, 2015
ACR25 Enrolled April 20, 2015
ACR25 Amended March 12, 2015
ACR25 Amended March 4, 2015
ACR25 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare