Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 554.) | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. To print. |