California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR35 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2015

Amended

Bill May 11, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015