Assembly
|
09/25/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3025.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2590.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1344.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|