Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2149.) | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1011.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2015 | Introduced. To print. |