Assembly | 03/20/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 332.) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Measure version as amended on January 16 corrected. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 172.) | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 12). | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/18/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/17/2014 | Introduced. To print. |