Assembly | 08/11/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1986.) | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 884.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Introduced. To print. |