Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1756.) | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1264.) | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |