Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2840.). | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2433.) | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2430.) | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Introduced. To print. |