Assembly | 06/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1546.) | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1481.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Introduced. To print. |