Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2203.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2321.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|