Assembly | 03/24/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 615.). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 332.) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Measure version as amended on March 9 corrected. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 270.) | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 2). | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2015 | Introduced. To print. |