Assembly | 07/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1789.) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2015 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | Introduced. To print. |