Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1122.) | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1367.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | Introduced. To print. |