Assembly | 07/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1791.) | ||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1763.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 22). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | Introduced. To print. |