LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR65
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR65
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR65
Compare Versions
ACR65 Chaptered September 10, 2015
ACR65 Enrolled September 2, 2015
ACR65 Amended August 17, 2015
ACR65 Amended July 9, 2015
ACR65 Amended May 22, 2015
ACR65 Introduced May 6, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR65 Chaptered September 10, 2015
ACR65 Enrolled September 2, 2015
ACR65 Amended August 17, 2015
ACR65 Amended July 9, 2015
ACR65 Amended May 22, 2015
ACR65 Introduced May 6, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare