Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2373.) | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2463.) | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Introduced. To print. |