Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2310.) | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2087.) | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Introduced. To print. |