Assembly | 06/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1551.) | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1633.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 22). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2015 | Introduced. To print. |