California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR7 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/16/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 7AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 2, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Rodriguez and Cooper (Coauthors: Assembly Members Calderon, Campos, Chvez, Lackey, Low,  and Olsen   Olsen,   Achadjian,   Alejo,   Travis Allen,   Atkins,   Baker,   Bigelow,   Bonilla,   Bonta,   Brown,   Chang,   Chau,   Chiu,   Chu,   Cooley,   Dababneh,   Dahle,   Daly,   Dodd,   Eggman,  Frazier,   Beth Gaines,   Gallagher,   Cristina Garcia,   Eduardo Garcia,   Gatto,   Gipson,   Gonzalez,   Grove,   Hadley,   Harper,   Roger Hernndez,  Holden,   Irwin,   Jones,   Jones-Sawyer,   Kim,   Levine,   Linder,   Lopez,   Mayes,   McCarty,   Medina,   Melendez,   Mullin,   Nazarian,   Obernolte,   O'Donnell,   Patterson,   Perea,   Quirk,   Rendon,   Salas,   Santiago,   Steinorth,   Mark Stone,   Thurmond,   Ting,   Wagner,   Waldron,   Weber,   Wilk,   Williams,   and Wood  ) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Bates, Block, Hall, Hertzberg, and Leno) JANUARY 6, 2015 Relative to National Night Out. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 7, as amended, Rodriguez. National Night Out. This measure would proclaim August 4, 2015, as National Night Out in California and would urge the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, On August 4, 2015, the National Association of Town Watch is joining with law enforcement agencies, communities, and business organizations throughout the nation to sponsor the 32nd Annual National Night Out, a unique, nationwide, crime prevention program; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is an evening for America to stand together and promote awareness, safety, and neighborhood unity; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is designed to increase crime prevention awareness; generate support for, and participation in, local anticrime efforts; strengthen neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships; and send a message to criminals, letting them know that neighborhoods are organized and fighting back; and WHEREAS, Residents in neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation are asked to join together on August 4, 2015, to spend the evening outside with their neighbors and police; and WHEREAS, Many neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation will be hosting a variety of special events on August 4, 2015, such as block parties, cookouts, parades, visits from police, flashlight walks, safety demonstrations, contests, youth activities, and anticrime rallies; and WHEREAS, National Night Out has proven to be an effective, inexpensive, and enjoyable program to promote neighborhood unity and encourage strong relationships between local community members and law enforcement agencies that will help to strengthen community safety throughout the entire year; and WHEREAS, National Night Out highlights the vital importance that citizen involvement has in our fight for a safer state and nation; and WHEREAS, Over 37.8 million people from over 16,124 communities from all 50 states, United States territories, Canadian cities, and military bases worldwide participated in National Night Out in 2014; and WHEREAS, National Night Out provides a unique opportunity for California to recognize the thousands of communities across the state and country promoting cooperative, police-community crime prevention efforts; and WHEREAS, It is essential that all people of California be aware of the importance of crime prevention programs and the impact that their participation can have on reducing crime; and WHEREAS, All people should be encouraged to join with their neighbors, local police and sheriff's departments, and the National Association of Town Watch in supporting the 32nd Annual National Night Out; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims August 4, 2015, as National Night Out in California and urges the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.