California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015