Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1668.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Introduced. To print. |