Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1617.) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1944.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2015 | Introduced. To print. |