LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR77
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR77
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR77
Compare Versions
ACR77 Chaptered September 3, 2015
ACR77 Enrolled August 27, 2015
ACR77 Amended July 9, 2015
ACR77 Amended June 24, 2015
ACR77 Introduced May 20, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR77 Chaptered September 3, 2015
ACR77 Enrolled August 27, 2015
ACR77 Amended July 9, 2015
ACR77 Amended June 24, 2015
ACR77 Introduced May 20, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare