Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2470.) | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | Introduced. To print. |