Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.) | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3891.) | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 8). | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Introduced. To print. |