Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2306.) | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2567.) | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 20). | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2015 | Introduced. To print. |