BILL NUMBER: ACR 99CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 190 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 21, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lopez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) JULY 16, 2015 Relative to Salvadoran American Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 99, Lopez. Salvadoran American Day. This measure would declare September 6, 2015, as Salvadoran American Day and would recognize the numerous contributions and rich heritage of Salvadoran Americans in California. WHEREAS, On August 6, 1525, the official founding of Villa de San Salvador was declared in the Valle de Las Hamacas (Valley of the Hammocks) where the indigenous ancestors of El Salvador fought historic battles against the submission and abuse of Spanish colonialism in order to preserve the life and liberty of the Cuscatleco population; and WHEREAS, On September 15, 1821, El Salvador achieved independence from Spain and ended centuries of Spanish colonialization; and WHEREAS, In the 20th century, 40 years of internal political turmoil forced hundreds of thousands of Salvadorans to flee El Salvador, seeking peace and security in a new country, the United States; and WHEREAS, Now Salvadoran Americans constitute one of the largest Latino communities in California, totaling over one million throughout the state and 6 percent of all immigrants nationwide; and WHEREAS, The history of our nation and California is a rich and enduring tapestry woven with the threads of many remarkable lives, cultures, and events, and the lives, work, and artistry of Salvadoran Americans has added strength, vitality, and purpose to that tapestry; and WHEREAS, The maturing Salvadoran American community continues to make great economic and cultural contributions to daily life in this state; and WHEREAS, Many of these admirable individuals actively participate in the state educational system, further promoting their sense of American pride within the California community; and WHEREAS, The strengths of the Salvadoran American culture can be preserved and passed on to future generations; and WHEREAS, Salvadoran American families, communities, and the generations that follow are committed to maintain both Salvadoran and American cultures, while promoting cultural interchange; and WHEREAS, September 2015 marks 194 years of independence for the country of El Salvador; and WHEREAS, Free of prejudices and as proud men and women, Salvadoran Americans participate in and contribute to the integration of the social, educational, professional, and political arena in California; now, therefore, be it Resolved, by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares September 6, 2015, as Salvadoran American Day and recognizes the rich heritage of Salvadoran Americans throughout California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.