LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR10
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR10
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR10
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2016
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
05/11/2015
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/06/2015
Referred to Com. on JUD.
Assembly
03/02/2015
Read first time. (pursuant to Joint Rules 4 and 6 this resolution will be treated as a bill.)
Assembly
03/01/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
Assembly
02/27/2015
Introduced. To print.