Assembly | 06/23/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1489.) | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1100.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2015 | Introduced. To print. |