Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 13). | ||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 2177.) | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | Introduced. To print. |