Assembly | 08/25/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2110.) | ||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 2146.) | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |