California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 11, 2016

Amended

Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016