Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/08/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2584.) | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2617.) | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |