Assembly
|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/21/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2947.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2505.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2465.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|