Assembly | 05/26/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | In committee: Refused adoption. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. (pursuant to Joint Rules 4 and 6 this resolution will be treated as a bill.) |