Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4675.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2016 | Introduced. To print. |