Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4876.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5083.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|