Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4986.) | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 5331.) | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Introduced. To print. |