Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 484.) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 24). | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 322.) | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (February 10). | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | Introduced. To print. |